Trustees FAMILY ACTION

Charity number: 264713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Hargrave Chair 22 March 2018
None on record
Krista McCluskey McKay Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record
Ayodele Arogundade Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record
Melanie Williams Browne Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record
Barin Brian Roy Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Dez Holmes Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Philippe Broadhead Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
PHILIP ANDREW BOWKLEY Trustee 15 December 2016
None on record
GEORGE ALASTAIR DUNNETT Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
Sophy Doyle Trustee 11 January 2016
JOHN BETTS' SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Paul John Hayes Trustee 11 January 2016
None on record
ROBERT WILFRID TAPSFIELD Trustee 11 January 2016
None on record