THE WEALD MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Weald Choir usually gives three public concerts each year, often in St Mary's Church in Crawley. Works performed are taken from the repertoire from the 16th century to the present day. Professional soloists and orchestral players are frequently engaged. Other performances to various organisations in Crawley as well as Christmas performances in the local library, shopping mall and Gatwick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 October 1972: Standard registration
- 19 June 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 19 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1169875 THE PHOENIX CHOIR OF CRAWLEY
- THE WEALD CHOIR (Working name)
- THE WEALD CHOIR OF CRAWLEY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.98k | £23.32k | £17.19k | £19.99k | £19.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £18.25k | £17.35k | £19.37k | £16.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 28 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 23 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 26 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window