LOUDWATER BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 264723
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.36k £13.15k £10.36k £8.93k £10.02k
Total expenditure £12.12k £11.41k £12.97k £9.51k £7.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A