KNIGHTS OF CHARITY

Charity number: 264762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.03k £1.11k £6.50k £5.34k £5.52k
Total expenditure £4.69k £5.88k £4.50k £5.30k £4.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A