Financial history THE DONKEY SANCTUARY

Charity number: 264818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £37.56m £42.31m £43.02m £36.96m £63.37m
Total expenditure £37.41m £40.03m £44.58m £42.52m £42.20m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £101.00k £129.00k £109.00k £1.10m £478.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £33.76m £38.21m £38.44m £32.41m £56.86m
Income - Other trading activities £2.88m £3.12m £3.68m £2.15m £4.15m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £675.00k £734.00k £664.00k £463.00k £484.00k
Income - Other £243.00k £239.00k £241.00k £1.94m £1.88m
Income - Legacies £23.30m £26.63m £26.05m £18.73m £41.61m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.84m £30.80m £33.28m £30.83m £30.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.57m £9.23m £11.29m £11.69m £12.00m
Expenditure - Governance £499.00k £579.00k £823.00k £1.07m £1.15m
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.34m £1.23m £892.00k £781.00k £636.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £119.00k £121.00k £112.00k £100.00k £107.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0