Financial history MELDRETH VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 264831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.55k £17.21k £22.13k £27.13k £20.04k
Total expenditure £15.53k £19.50k £23.29k £11.16k £29.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £6.08k £22.91k £10.67k