MELDRETH VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 264831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS PAT GILMORE Trustee 12 September 2017 None on record
Paul Ray Chair 11 June 2013 None on record
LESLEY JACQUELINE SPRATT Trustee 09 January 2018 None on record
David Coton Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record
JOHN PHILIP RICHARDS Trustee 12 September 2017 None on record
Christine Joan Fallon Trustee 16 November 2021
MELDRETH PARISH CHARITIES Received: On time
BERNICE GREGORY Trustee None on record
WENDY BRAID Trustee 09 January 2018 None on record