Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF ST MARYLEBONE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 264850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 May 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 May 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required