Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF ST MARYLEBONE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 264850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £3.60k £6.94k £8.60k £9.34k £7.02k
Total expenditure £6.66k £9.27k £7.36k £14.19k £7.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A