THE BRITISH ANTIQUE DEALERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 264856
Charity reporting is overdue by 218 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 218 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 218 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 May 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 May 2020 10 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time Download