Financial history WINCHESTER CITY FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity number: 264859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.56k £14.56k £18.63k £7.99k £8.46k
Total expenditure £13.52k £12.78k £15.59k £3.57k £5.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A