NORFOLK LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 264867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 29 May 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required