WATERBEACH VILLAGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 264909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £773 £463 £600 £660 £154
Total expenditure £710 £592 £700 £625 £195
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A