Accounts and annual returns THE RONALD TAIT TRUST

Charity number: 264979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 01 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required