Accounts and annual returns THE SIR MARK AND LADY TURNER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 264994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required