Governing document Cambridgeshire, Peterborough and South Lincolnshire (CPSL) Mind Limited
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOV 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 SEP 2016 as amended on 10 May 2019 as amended on 10 May 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO WORK FOR AND PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MENTAL ILLNESS AMONG BOTH ADULTS AND CHILDREN B) TO WORK FOR AND PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL ILLNESS AND TO OBTAIN AND MAKE RECORDS OF AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING THE SAME.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.