Cambridgeshire, Peterborough and South Lincolnshire (CPSL) Mind Limited

Charity number: 265087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrea Grosbois Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
Deborah Richards Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
Carol Clarke Trustee 05 November 2019 None on record
Louise Adcock Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
Anna Granta Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Sharon Gilfoyle Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
Richard Young Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
Alan Tait Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
Maria Huber Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record