Financial history THE FOULKES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 265166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £130.65k £109.90k £131.91k £89.61k £66.84k
Total expenditure £137.48k £116.43k £122.51k £95.76k £93.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A