ALDERNEY MANOR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 265415
Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Renting hall for over 60,s social events, harbourside Trust Care,Scope.Church Meetings etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £19,231
Total expenditure: £34,755

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Crighton Chair 26 April 2015
None on record
Andy Cole Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
KAREN STOKES Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.61k £40.35k £97.08k £40.68k £19.23k
Total expenditure £55.03k £56.24k £50.62k £50.48k £34.76k
Income from government contracts £1.89k £1.83k £1.06k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.33k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2023 736 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 January 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 January 2021 85 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Alderney Manor Community Centre
287 Herbert Avenue
POOLE
Dorset
BH12 4HT
Phone:
01202 740026
Website:

No information available