COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH FOUNDATION FOR THE ARCH DIOCESE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND

Charity number: 265418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download