Financial history COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH FOUNDATION FOR THE ARCH DIOCESE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND

Charity number: 265418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £855.99k £693.98k £947.47k £775.03k £1.41m
Total expenditure £504.90k £1.79m £553.04k £416.83k £1.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £597.10k £428.96k £670.23k £547.76k £934.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £24.47k £30.66k £31.85k £80 £1.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £204.39k £234.36k £245.40k £227.18k £469.28k
Income - Other £30.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £367.46k £341.34k £449.67k £329.17k £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £74.42k £86.28k £81.23k £51.03k £86.34k
Expenditure - Governance £55.49k £10.68k £11.71k £12.20k £11.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £81.23k £6.54k £86.34k
Expenditure - Other £63.03k £1.36m £22.13k £36.63k £44.17k