Trustees PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE

Charity number: 265483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shelagh Harrison Chair 12 September 2017
None on record
Eve Catherine Bradshaw Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Rev JOHN WHITTAKER Trustee 02 September 2018
MILES TRUST FOR THE PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
PEST HOUSES FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY
Received: On time
ST MARY'S PARISH TRUST
Received: 2 days late
THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Antonia Wainman Trustee 10 July 2018
None on record
GRAHAM SHAW OBE Trustee 10 July 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Willatts Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Jane Grant Trustee 29 January 2014
None on record
MRS SALLY WILKINS Trustee
None on record