MSI REPRODUCTIVE CHOICES

Charity number: 265543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £289.96m £296.12m £296.85m £308.27m £294.44m
Total expenditure £279.84m £300.89m £289.15m £301.41m £288.10m
Income from government contracts £28.74m £27.22m £66.25m £60.47m £61.52m
Income from government grants £46.54m £44.07m £11.09m £14.86m £13.90m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.14m £3.72m £4.01m £8.83m £10.04m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £282.67m £286.78m £286.53m £293.03m £277.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £706.00k £777.00k £1.01m £1.43m £861.00k
Income - Other £4.45m £4.85m £5.30m £4.98m £6.28m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £278.75m £299.39m £287.77m £300.15m £286.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.09m £1.50m £1.37m £1.26m £1.27m
Expenditure - Governance £1.26m £1.69m £1.45m £1.25m £1.28m
Expenditure - Grants institution £16.57m £14.20m £14.01m £16.73m £16.24m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £42.00k £41.00k £41.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0