Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL BROOM

Charity number: 265576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 November 2019 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required