EARTH RESOURCES RESEARCH LIMITED

Charity number: 265628
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

02 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)