THE SAMWORTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 265647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 26 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 13 September 2017 On time Download