Financial history THE SAMWORTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 265647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £599.50k £707.85k £845.69k £776.68k £2.26m
Total expenditure £2.54m £2.46m £2.37m £3.05m £4.78m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.99k £9.78k £8.94k £2.74k £1.68m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £583.52k £698.07k £836.76k £773.94k £581.99k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.54m £2.46m £2.37m £3.05m £4.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £19.63k £30.20k £68.65k £68.65k £51.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.44m £2.28m £2.17m £2.98m £4.58m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0