BRITISH SOCIETY FOR CELL BIOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the advancement of research in relation to all branches of cell biology and to encourage the interchange of information. By organizing conferences each year on relevant cell biology topics ; promoting school education; providing support for local meetings, young scientists to attend conferences and undergraduate vacation projects; issuing a newsletter and maintaining a website
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 November 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Laura Machesky | Chair | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Nightingale | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ciaran Morrison | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giampietro Schiavo | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.04k | £131.99k | £61.39k | £68.47k | £103.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.00k | £54.44k | £57.99k | £135.79k | £130.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF CELL BIOLOGY AND RELATED SUBJECTS.B) TO FURTHER PUBLIC EDUCATION THEREIN.C) TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH WORK IN CELL BIOLOGY AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Queen Square Institute of Neurology
University College London
Queen Square
London
WC1N 3BG
- Phone:
- 01133433007
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window