COMBE MARTIN SENIOR CITIZENS CENTRE

Charity number: 265911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.45k £7.73k £9.80k £5.48k £6.75k
Total expenditure £7.37k £9.52k £8.35k £6.26k £5.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A