BATH ARTS WORKSHOP LIMITED

Charity number: 266038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 February 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 February 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download