Accounts and annual returns EAST BERGHOLT SOCIETY

Charity number: 266062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 April 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required