DEVON HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the rescue of the historic buildings of the county of Devon for the people of Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 24 August 1973: Standard registration
- 31 March 2025: Funds received from 1034490 THE STRINGER LAWRENCE MEMORIAL TRUST
- DEVON HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Gordon KINGSCOTE | Chair | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Andrea Vivienne Davis | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|||||
David Richard George | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Paul WICKHAM | Trustee | 17 July 2001 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN LOMAS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.63k | £69.66k | £78.83k | £59.09k | £10.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.33k | £102.12k | £129.59k | £251.35k | £28.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.22k | £20.35k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH JUNE 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 MARCH 2010. as amended on 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST ON AND AROUND THE COUNTY OF DEVON AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, OR ANCIENT MONUMENTS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 CLYST HEATH
EXETER
EX2 7TA
- Phone:
- 01392 833846
- Email:
- haldonbelvedere@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window