Governing document EXETER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN (SAINT OLAVE'S TRUST)
Charity number: 266131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 DEC. 1971, AS AMENDED ON 8 JUL 1992. AS AMENDED ON 04/07/2005 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN (BOYS AND GIRLS) IN NEED. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE ASSOCIATION SHALL HAVE POWER TO MAKE GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN SIMILAR WORK.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.