PULHAM ST MARY (NORFOLK) VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 266194
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 Overdue Overdue by 3943 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 16 April 2010 On time
Annual return 30 September 2008 30 March 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 30 March 2009 On time
Annual return 30 September 2007 12 March 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 31 January 2007 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 28 February 2006 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required