PULHAM ST MARY (NORFOLK) VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 266194
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £7.19k £8.77k £9.52k £8.42k £7.17k
Total expenditure £3.75k £5.49k £5.85k £5.90k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A