BENTLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.06k £10.08k £20.98k £30.63k £30.46k
Total expenditure £13.96k £16.82k £12.42k £26.27k £23.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £760 £1.26k
Income from government grants £2.00k £0 N/A N/A £500