BENTLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Macnaghten Trustee 07 November 2016
BENTLEY MEMORIAL HALL ASSOCIATION Recently registered
GLYN BARFOOT Trustee 12 May 2012
BENTLEY MEMORIAL HALL ASSOCIATION Recently registered
ELLEN ANNE SAUNDERS Trustee 27 June 2017
BENTLEY MEMORIAL HALL ASSOCIATION Recently registered
RICHARD GREENWAY Trustee 12 October 2015
BENTLEY MEMORIAL HALL ASSOCIATION Recently registered
GRAHAM ANDREW OWLETT Trustee 27 June 2017
BENTLEY MEMORIAL HALL ASSOCIATION Recently registered
STEVE FICE Chair 27 June 2017 None on record
Dr Nigel David Clark Trustee 02 May 2019
BENTLEY MEMORIAL HALL ASSOCIATION Recently registered
Richard Edwards Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record