CREATIVE YOUTH NETWORK

Charity number: 266318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.18m £1.91m £2.23m £3.73m £4.51m
Total expenditure £1.97m £1.87m £2.18m £3.48m £4.29m
Income from government contracts £706.86k £1 £561.16k £1.62m £2.23m
Income from government grants £221.05k £1 £152.70k £135.11k £186.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £168.81k £17.30k £32.41k £64.63k £15.06k
Income - Other trading activities £29.31k £16.05k £10.09k £7.32k £7.77k
Income - Charitable activities £2.13m £1.84m £2.19m £3.66m £4.49m
Income - Endowments £150.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.32k £4.09k £2.66k £1.41k £2.18k
Income - Other £0 £29.20k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.91m £1.83m £2.13m £3.42m £4.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £42.14k £44.74k £58.50k £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.90k £17.70k £19.50k £16.80k £16.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0