THE WAGNER SOCIETY

Charity number: 266383
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 December 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 December 2020 34 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time Download