THE WAGNER SOCIETY

Charity number: 266383
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN RIDGEWELL Chair 09 August 2017 None on record
MELI HATZIHRYSIDIS Trustee 15 November 2017
SONG IN THE CITY CHARITY TRUST Received: On time
JOANNA COUSINS Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
NEIL GEORGE KING Trustee 10 December 2013 None on record
Tom Brown Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
RICHARD JOHN MILES Trustee 08 May 2012 None on record
ISABELLA PITMAN Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
HENRY KENNEDY Trustee 20 September 2017 None on record