Governing document THE FINCHLEY SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 22 MAY 1975 AND 25 MAY 1983 AND 26 JUNE 2003 AND 26 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE FORMER BOROUGH OF FINCHLEY AND URBAN DISTRICT OF FRIERN BARNET.B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.