Trustees THE FINCHLEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 266403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Crick Chair 01 April 2015
None on record
Ali Dezyanian Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
Tony Kirkham Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
Lynn Bresler Trustee 04 February 2016
None on record
HARRIET COPPERMAN Trustee 26 June 2014
None on record
Rosemary Coates Trustee 10 December 2013
None on record
PETER MARSH Trustee
None on record
DAVID SMITH Trustee
None on record
PETER PICKERING Trustee
None on record