NEW ASH GREEN VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
promote the benefit of the inhabitants of New Ash Green, Kent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 16 November 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY JAMES VIVIAN | Chair | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joe Whittaker | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gordon Banks | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|||||
John Kelly | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|||||
DANIELLE ELISAK | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAWN HUNT | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HOBBS | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.57k | £25.26k | £25.69k | £26.34k | £35.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.91k | £21.19k | £24.72k | £27.98k | £39.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/06/1973 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF NEW ASH GREEN IN KENT IN ANY WAY THAT THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES REGARDS AS CHARITABLE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OR IMPROVEMENT OF LOCAL AMENITIES AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OR IMPROVEMENT OF PLAYGROUNDS, RECREATIONAL AREAS, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT AND BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF COMMUNAL AREAS AND WOODLANDS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NEW ASH GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Caling Croft
New Ash Green
Longfield
DA3 8PX
- Phone:
- 07710214966
- Email:
- info@nagyc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window