THE FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL - ROEHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve patients and former patients of Queen Mary's Hospital who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial assistance and generally to support the charitable work of the said Hospital by providing various voluntary services and extra amenities for such Patients and Staff in the Hospital at the discretion of the Executive Committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 06 December 1973: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARYS HOSPITAL ROEHAMPTON (Working name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL ROEHAMPTON (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL ROEHAMPTON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Rushton Shiplee | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Stirrat | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Johnstone | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Perry-Greene | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Emily Brown | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Patricia Dangoor | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|||||
MR CLIVE NICOLSON | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.57k | £216.46k | £151.13k | £135.54k | £54.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.48k | £66.82k | £46.22k | £75.16k | £139.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/10/1973 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/1993 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING VARIOUS VOLUNTARY SERVICES AND EXTRA AMENITIES FOR SUCH PATIENTS AND FOR STAFF IN THE HOSPITAL AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Friends of Queen Mary's
Hospital - Roehampton
Queen Marys Hospital
Roehampton Lane
LONDON
SW15 5PN
- Phone:
- 02084876315
- Email:
- friends.qmh@stgeorges.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window