Accounts and annual returns BRITISH MERCHANT NAVY WELFARE SOCIETY ALEXANDRIA

Charity number: 266456
Charity reporting is overdue by 875 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 510 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 510 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 875 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 875 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required