THE WOOLMARKET

Charity number: 266477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 March 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 November 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required