PETER AND BEVERLEY OLSBERG CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family Charity which distributes income from investments to a variety of Charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1974: Standard registration
- 25 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.29k | £3.29k | £3.29k | £3.29k | £3.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £2.50k | £3.53k | £3.60k | £3.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 19 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 15 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 17 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR UNCONTROLLD DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window