WEST OXFORDSHIRE ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 October 2017 On time Download