14TH EXETER (ST LUKES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 266558
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Overdue Overdue by 4116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Overdue Overdue by 4116 days
Annual return 31 March 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4481 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4481 days
Annual return 31 March 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4847 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4847 days
Annual return 31 March 2006 Overdue Overdue by 5212 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Overdue Overdue by 5212 days
Annual return 31 March 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5577 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5577 days