MUSIC-AT-HILL

Charity number: 266570
Charity reporting is 397 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not yet received
31 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not yet received
31 days overdue
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not yet received
397 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not yet received
397 days overdue
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 June 2018 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)